PA HR863 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Adopted (191-11)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Adopted (191-11)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the 125th anniversary of the Pennsylvania School Boards Association.
Title
Recognizing the 125th anniversary of the Pennsylvania School Boards Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-29 - House - House Floor: HR 863 PN 3736 (Y: 191 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Adopted (191-11) |
2020-09-23 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |