PA HR872 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-14 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging Federal and State regulatory agencies to utilize science-based, peer-reviewed data in evaluating crop protection chemistry and nutrients.
Title
Urging Federal and State regulatory agencies to utilize science-based, peer-reviewed data in evaluating crop protection chemistry and nutrients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | House | Removed from table |
2016-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |