PA HR875 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Adopted (201-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating May 14, 2020, as "Apraxia Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating May 14, 2020, as "Apraxia Awareness Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HR 875 PN 3769 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Adopted (201-0) |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred to HEALTH |