PA HR917 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on November 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-18 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on November 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-18 - Adopted (202-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of July 2020 as "MECP2 Duplication Syndrome Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of July 2020 as "MECP2 Duplication Syndrome Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: HR 917 PN 4001 (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Adopted (202-0) |
2020-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred to HEALTH |