PA HR935 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Adopted (200-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of October 2020 as "Lifesharing Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of October 2020 as "Lifesharing Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HR 935 PN 4104 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Adopted (200-0) |
2020-08-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-07-08 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |