PA SB1027 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in organization of independent administrative boards and commissions, further providing for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board; in organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for State Geospatial Coordinating Board; in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for Department of Health; in powers and duties of the Department of State and its departmental administrative board, providing for report on implementation of 2020 general primary election; providing for COVID-19 emergency statutory and regulatory suspensions and waivers reporting requirements, for COVID-19 debt cost reduction review and for licensing; and, in judicial administration, further providing for surcharges and fees; and making a related repeal.
Title
In organization of independent administrative boards and commissions, further providing for Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board; in organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for State Geospatial Coordinating Board; in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for Department of Health; in powers and duties of the Department of State and its departmental administrative board, providing for report on implementation of 2020 general primary election; providing for COVID-19 emergency statutory and regulatory suspensions and waivers reporting requirements, for COVID-19 debt cost reduction review and for licensing; and, in judicial administration, further providing for surcharges and fees; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] |
Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1027 PN 1729, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1027 PN 1729, FP (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Motion to Re-Consider Vote (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05913 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05955 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1027 PN 1621, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1027 PN 1729, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1027 PN 1729, FP (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Motion to Re-Consider Vote (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05913 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05955 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1027 PN 1621, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Veto No. 8 |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (29-21) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-05-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (109-93) |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-04-29 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-29 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-04-20 | House | In the House |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |