PA SB1036 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for definitions.
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |