PA SB1043 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-01 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-01 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in preliminary provisions, further providing for method of payment and method of filing; in Department of Revenue, further providing for transmission of money; in agents for collection, further providing for corporate treasurers; in bonus and tax records, further providing for corporate loans and tax, for municipal loans and tax and for monthly statements by registers of wills; in collections other than by settlement, further providing for driver's license fees and for amounts payable to State institutions; in procedure for disbursement of money from State Treasury, providing for reimbursement for administrative costs; in special funds, further providing for funding and for transfer and providing for other grants; providing for additional special funds; in general budget implementation, providing for the Motor License Fund; in 2012-2013 budget implementation, further providing for the Department of Public Welfare; in 2012-2013 restrictions on appropriations, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund; providing for 2013-2014 budget implementation; providing for 2013-2014 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; in audits, further providing for Race Horse Development Funds; and making related repeals.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for method of payment and method of filing; in Department of Revenue, further providing for transmission of money; in agents for collection, further providing for corporate treasurers; in bonus and tax records, further providing for corporate loans and tax, for municipal loans and tax and for monthly statements by registers of wills; in collections other than by settlement, further providing for driver's license fees and for amounts payable to State institutions; in procedure for disbursement of money from State Treasury, providing for reimbursement for administrative costs; in special funds, further providing for funding and for transfer and providing for other grants; providing for additional special funds; in general budget implementation, providing for the Motor License Fund; in 2012-2013 budget implementation, further providing for the Department of Public Welfare; in 2012-2013 restrictions on appropriations, further providing for Veterans' Trust Fund; providing for 2013-2014 budget implementation; providing for 2013-2014 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; in audits, further providing for Race Horse Development Funds; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-30 - Senate - SB 1043 PN 1321, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-30 - Senate - SB 1043 PN 1321, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-30 | House | In the House |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |