PA SB107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] |
Sen. Patrick Browne [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |