PA SB1089 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-21 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-21 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of September 1, 1965 (P.L.420, No.215), known as The Frozen Dessert Law.
Title
Repealing the act of September 1, 1965 (P.L.420, No.215), known as The Frozen Dessert Law.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |