PA SB109 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in accidents and accident reports, further providing for duty to give information and render aid.
Title
In accidents and accident reports, further providing for duty to give information and render aid.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |