PA SB1092 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving domestic violence in the presence of a minor.
Title
In sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving domestic violence in the presence of a minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1092 PN 1710, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1092 PN 1710, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: SB 1092 PN 1710, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1092 PN 1710, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 157 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-15 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-05-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-05-23 | House | In the House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2018-04-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |