PA SB1097 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-29 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 57 (Notaries Public) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Uniform Unsworn Foreign Declarations Act, further providing for heading of chapter, for short title of chapter, for definitions, for applicability and for form of unsworn declaration, and, in revised uniform law on notarial acts, further providing for authority to perform notarial act, providing for notarial act performed by remotely located individual and further providing for notification regarding performance of notarial act on electronic record and selection of technology.
Title
In Uniform Unsworn Foreign Declarations Act, further providing for heading of chapter, for short title of chapter, for definitions, for applicability and for form of unsworn declaration, and, in revised uniform law on notarial acts, further providing for authority to perform notarial act, providing for notarial act performed by remotely located individual and further providing for notification regarding performance of notarial act on electronic record and selection of technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1097 PN 1622, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2020-04-28 | House | In the House |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |