PA SB110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in home rule and optional plan government, further providing for submission of question for election of government study commission and for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In home rule and optional plan government, further providing for submission of question for election of government study commission and for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 110 PN 82, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-04-29HouseIn the House
2019-04-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2019-04-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-04-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-08SenateSecond consideration
2019-03-26SenateFirst consideration
2019-03-26SenateReported as committed
2019-01-24SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback