PA SB1108 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 2A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 2A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of June 28, 2019 (P.L.839, No. 1A), known as the General Appropriation Act of 2019, adding Federal appropriations to the Executive Department of the Commonwealth for the fiscal year July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2020.
Title
A Supplement to the act of June 28, 2019 (P.L.839, No. 1A), known as the General Appropriation Act of 2019, adding Federal appropriations to the Executive Department of the Commonwealth for the fiscal year July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05976 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1108 PN 1730, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1108 PN 1730, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1108 PN 1654, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1108 PN 1730, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1108 PN 1730, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1108 PN 1654, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-29 | Senate | Act No. 2A |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-05-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-04-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-28 | House | Second consideration |
2020-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2020-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-04-21 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-21 | House | In the House |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |