PA SB1110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 23, 1956 (1955 P.L.1510, No.500), known at the Disease Prevention and Control Law of 1955, further providing for definitions, for reports and for confidentiality of reports and records; and providing for confidentiality provisions during disaster emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for reports and for confidentiality of reports and records; and providing for confidentiality provisions during disaster emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1110 PN 2107, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS-RECOSIDERED (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1110 PN 2107, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1110 PN 2107, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1110 PN 1702, 2019 A7717, FRANKEL (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A05626 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A05773 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A05753 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1110 PN 1661, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1110 PN 1659, A5376, KILLION AMENDMENT NO. A-5376 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1110 PN 1651, A5309, HAYWOOD AMENDMENT NO. A-5309 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-03SenateAct No. 112
2020-11-03SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-10-26SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-10-26SenateSigned in House
2020-10-21SenateSigned in Senate
2020-10-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (47-0)
2020-10-21SenateVote on concurrence reconsidered
2020-10-21SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (45-2)
2020-10-21SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-10-21SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-10-21SenateIn the Senate
2020-10-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-10-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-08-31HouseRemoved from table
2020-08-31HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-26HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-18HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-18HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-18HouseReported as amended
2020-04-29HouseReferred to HEALTH
2020-04-29HouseIn the House
2020-04-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-3)
2020-04-29SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-04-28SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-04-28SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-04-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-21SenateSecond consideration
2020-04-20SenateFirst consideration
2020-04-20SenateReported as amended
2020-04-13SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1110
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1110&pn=1633
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1110&pn=1651
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1110&pn=1659
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1110&pn=1661
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1110&pn=1702
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1110&pn=2107
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=04/20/2020&RollCallId=797
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=439
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/28/2020&RollCallId=832
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=448
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=449
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/18/2020&RollCallId=1969
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/18/2020&RollCallId=1970
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/18/2020&RollCallId=1989
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/18/2020&RollCallId=1971
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1687
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1702
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=722
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/21/2020&RollCallId=1269
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/21/2020&RollCallId=2613

Bill Comments

feedback