PA SB1112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in alternative form of regulation of telecommunications services, further providing for additional powers and duties of commission.
Title
In alternative form of regulation of telecommunications services, further providing for additional powers and duties of commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1112 PN 2010, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2020-10-21 | House | In the House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (33-16) |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |