PA SB112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to HEALTH
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in prescribing opioids to minors, providing for prescribing opioids to individuals and further providing for definitions, for prohibition and for procedure; and making editorial changes.
Title
In prescribing opioids to minors, providing for prescribing opioids to individuals and further providing for definitions, for prohibition and for procedure; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 112 PN 1017, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 112 PN 1017, A2213, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-2213 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 112 PN 508, A2155, YAW AMENDMENT NO. A-2155 (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 112 PN 1017, A2213, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-2213 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 112 PN 508, A2155, YAW AMENDMENT NO. A-2155 (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2019-06-19 | House | In the House |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (28-22) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |