PA SB1122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in volunteer firefighters, further providing for funds; and, in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, providing for COVID-19 Crisis Fire Company and Emergency Medical Services Grant Program.
Title
In volunteer firefighters, further providing for funds; and, in grants to fire companies and emergency medical services companies, providing for COVID-19 Crisis Fire Company and Emergency Medical Services Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05864 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1122 PN 1731, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1122 PN 1731, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1122 PN 1699, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Amendment A05353 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05864 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1122 PN 1731, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1122 PN 1731, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1122 PN 1699, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Amendment A05353 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-29 | Senate | Act No. 26 |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-05-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-05-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-27 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-12 | House | In the House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Amended in Senate Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-04-17 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |