PA SB1125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, further providing for application of act and for discounts, penalties and notice.
Title
Further providing for application of act and for discounts, penalties and notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: SB 1125 PN 1759, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1125 PN 1759, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: SB 1125 PN 1759, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1125 PN 1759, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Act No. 75 |
2020-07-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-14 | House | Signed in House |
2020-07-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-07-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-13 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-13 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-07 | House | First consideration |
2020-07-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2020-06-10 | House | In the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |