PA SB1166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-16 - Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-16 - Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing separate and distinct amendments to the Constitution of Pennsylvania, in declaration of rights, providing for prohibition against denial or abridgment of equality of rights because of race and ethnicity; in legislation, further providing for action on concurrent orders and resolutions; and, in the executive, providing for disaster emergency declaration and management.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing separate and distinct amendments to the Constitution of Pennsylvania, in declaration of rights, providing for prohibition against denial or abridgment of equality of rights because of race and ethnicity; in legislation, further providing for action on concurrent orders and resolutions; and, in the executive, providing for disaster emergency declaration and management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1166 PN 1835, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: SB 1166 PN 1835, FP (Y: 115 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: SB 1166 PN 1835, NEILSON, MOT RECMT STATE GOVT (Y: 92 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: SB 1166 PN 1835, DIAMOND, MOVE PREV QUESTION (Y: 107 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06548 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06547 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1166 PN 1770, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1166 PN 1753, A6201, BOSCOLA AMENDMENT NO. A-6201 (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1166 PN 1753, A6132, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-6132 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1166 PN 1835, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: SB 1166 PN 1835, FP (Y: 115 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: SB 1166 PN 1835, NEILSON, MOT RECMT STATE GOVT (Y: 92 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: SB 1166 PN 1835, DIAMOND, MOVE PREV QUESTION (Y: 107 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06548 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06547 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1166 PN 1770, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1166 PN 1753, A6201, BOSCOLA AMENDMENT NO. A-6201 (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1166 PN 1753, A6132, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-6132 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Senate | Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 4 |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Filed in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (33-17) |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-07-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (115-86) |
2020-07-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-13 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-13 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-07 | House | First consideration |
2020-07-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-06-10 | House | In the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-6) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (50-0) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |