PA SB1182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 8, 1986 (P.L.437, No.92), known as the Pennsylvania Agricultural Fair Act, further providing for advisory committee; and providing for COVID-19 Emergency Agricultural Fair Grants.
Title
Further providing for advisory committee; and providing for COVID-19 Emergency Agricultural Fair Grants.
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Brooks [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: SB 1182 PN 2108, 2019 A7865, M. K. KELLER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07633 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07749 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07633 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07749 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1182 PN 1826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07633 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07749 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07633 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07749 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1182 PN 1826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-11-18 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-21 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2108 |
2020-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-10-20 | House | First consideration |
2020-10-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-07-08 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-06-30 | House | In the House |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |