PA SB119 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, providing for regulatory reduction and for regulatory baseline and public availability.
Title
Providing for regulatory reduction and for regulatory baseline and public availability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |