PA SB1199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-01 - Act No. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions and providing for personal delivery devices; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions and providing for personal delivery devices; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1199 PN 2042, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 1199 PN 2042, FP (Y: 105 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: SB 1199 PN 1952, 2019 A7425, SCHROEDER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: SB 1199 PN 1952, 2019 A7415, SCHROEDER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07132 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1199 PN 1823, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1199 PN 1773, A6482, AUMENT AMENDMENT NO. A-6482 RECONSIDERED (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1199 PN 1773, A6482, AUMENT AMENDMENT NO. A-6482 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-01SenateAct No. 106
2020-11-01SenateBecame Law without Governor's signature
2020-10-21SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-10-20SenateSigned in House
2020-10-20SenateSigned in Senate
2020-10-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (29-19)
2020-10-20SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-10-20SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-10-19SenateIn the Senate
2020-10-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (105-97)
2020-10-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-09-30HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-09-29HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-17HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-17HouseReported as amended
2020-07-08HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2020-06-30HouseIn the House
2020-06-30SenateThird consideration and final passage (31-19)
2020-06-29SenateAmended on third consideration (42-8)
2020-06-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-22SenateReported as committed
2020-06-15SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=1199
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1199&pn=1773
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1199&pn=1823
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1199&pn=1952
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=1199&pn=2042
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=985
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=1009
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=567
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=569
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2478
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2480
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1636
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1637
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1664
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=686
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/20/2020&RollCallId=1242
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/19/2020&RollCallId=2595

Bill Comments

feedback