PA SB1205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in employees, providing for use of force and deadly force model policy for law enforcement agencies.
Title
In employees, providing for use of force and deadly force model policy for law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1205 PN 1818, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1205 PN 1818, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-06-24 | House | In the House |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |