PA SB1210 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 26, 1951 (P.L.1539, No.389), known as The Clinical Laboratory Act, further providing for definitions and for exemptions.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |