PA SB1220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 74 (Transportation) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in turnpike, further providing for commission powers and duties.
Title
In turnpike, further providing for commission powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-21 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |