PA SB1235 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 160
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 10, 1974 (P.L.852, No.287), referred to as the Underground Utility Line Protection Law, further providing for expiration.
Title
Further providing for expiration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 2162, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 1235 PN 2162, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A10454 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 1894, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 1894, A9325, HUTCHINSON AMENDMENT NO. A-9325 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 1235 PN 2162, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A10454 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 1894, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 1894, A9325, HUTCHINSON AMENDMENT NO. A-9325 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | Act No. 160 |
2016-11-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2016-10-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-24 | House | Second consideration |
2016-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-10-18 | House | First consideration |
2016-10-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-10-03 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2016-09-27 | House | In the House |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (34-14) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |