PA SB1235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the concurrence of the Department of Environmental Protection, to lease to L-A Battery, QOZ, LLC land within the bed of the Delaware River within the City of Philadelphia.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the concurrence of the Department of Environmental Protection, to lease to L-A Battery, QOZ, LLC land within the bed of the Delaware River within the City of Philadelphia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1235 PN 1853, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-15 | House | In the House |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-4) |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-07-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-07-12 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |