PA SB127 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in 911 emergency communication services, further providing for definitions, for telecommunications management, for counties, for fund, for telephone records, for inventory and for termination of chapter.
Title
In 911 emergency communication services, further providing for definitions, for telecommunications management, for counties, for fund, for telephone records, for inventory and for termination of chapter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 127 PN 961, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 127 PN 961, FP (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01925 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 127 PN 419, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 127 PN 961, FP (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01925 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 127 PN 419, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 17 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-2) |
2019-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-03-26 | House | In the House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |