PA SB128 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 51 (Military Affairs) and 74 (Transportation) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, providing for Civil Air Patrol; and, in authority of Department of Transportation, further providing for authority of department.
Title
In Department of Military Affairs, providing for Civil Air Patrol; and, in authority of Department of Transportation, further providing for authority of department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 128 PN 1045, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 128 PN 1045, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 128 PN 91, 2019 A1836, BARRAR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 128 PN 91, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 128 PN 1045, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 128 PN 91, 2019 A1836, BARRAR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 128 PN 91, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 60 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-03-18 | House | In the House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |