PA SB1281 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for schedule of convictions and points; in rules of the road in general, further providing for duty of driver in emergency response areas; and, in offenses in general, further providing for the offenses of homicide by vehicle and of aggravated assault by vehicle.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for schedule of convictions and points; in rules of the road in general, further providing for duty of driver in emergency response areas; and, in offenses in general, further providing for the offenses of homicide by vehicle and of aggravated assault by vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1281 PN 2103, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1281 PN 2103, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1281 PN 2040, 2019 A7624, KORTZ (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07356 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1281 PN 1943, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1281 PN 2103, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1281 PN 2103, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1281 PN 2040, 2019 A7624, KORTZ (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A07356 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1281 PN 1943, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 105 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-10-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-10-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-30 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-09-23 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-09-22 | House | In the House |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |