PA SB133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-19 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for Lieutenant Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for Lieutenant Governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - House - House Floor: SB 133 PN 1185, 2019 A3800, BOYLE (Y: 96 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-09-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02666 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 133 PN 110, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-19HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-19HouseSecond consideration
2019-11-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-24HouseReported as amended
2019-05-02HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-04-29HouseIn the House
2019-04-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-2)
2019-04-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-20SenateSecond consideration
2019-02-05SenateFirst consideration
2019-02-05SenateReported as committed
2019-01-31SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=133
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0133&pn=0110
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0133&pn=1185
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=02/05/2019&RollCallId=13
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/08/2019&RollCallId=83
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=48
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1119
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1120
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=854

Bill Comments

feedback