PA SB149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for rights of victims of crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for rights of victims of crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-03SenateRemoved from table
2019-06-03SenateLaid on the table
2019-03-27SenateFirst consideration
2019-03-27SenateReported as committed
2019-02-01SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback