PA SB174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the tax sale of abandoned properties.
Title
Providing for the tax sale of abandoned properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |