PA SB201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |