PA SB238 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 10A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 10A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Title
Making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 238 PN 989, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 238 PN 989, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 238 PN 989, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Act No. 10A |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | House | In the House |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |