PA SB242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 14A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 14A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2020.
Title
Making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: SB 242 PN 993, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 242 PN 993, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 242 PN 993, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Act No. 14A |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | House | In the House |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |