PA SB251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions and for existing regulations; and establishing the Independent Office of the Repealer and providing for its power and duties.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for existing regulations; and establishing the Independent Office of the Repealer and providing for its power and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |