PA SB257 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, providing for quality eye care for insured Pennsylvanians.
Title
Providing for quality eye care for insured Pennsylvanians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A07682 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 257 PN 1761, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A07682 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 257 PN 1761, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-11-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-05-24 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2018-05-23 | House | In the House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |