PA SB258 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in service and facilities, providing for pipeline emergency management information.
Title
In service and facilities, providing for pipeline emergency management information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |