PA SB275 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses), 23 (Domestic Relations) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of stalking; in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for definitions; in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction; in domestic and sexual violence victim address confidentiality, further providing for penalties; and, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for second and subsequent offenses.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of stalking; in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for definitions; in child custody, further providing for consideration of criminal conviction; in domestic and sexual violence victim address confidentiality, further providing for penalties; and, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for second and subsequent offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: SB 275 PN 694, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 275 PN 694, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Floor: SB 275 PN 694, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 275 PN 694, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | House | Act No. 32 |
2020-06-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed in House |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-05-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-14 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-14 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-06-03 | House | In the House |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |