PA SB276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for blind veteran's pension and for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.
Title
In veterans' pensions and benefits, further providing for blind veteran's pension and for amputee and paralyzed veteran's pension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 276 PN 227, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-06-08 | House | In the House |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |