PA SB277 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for home care, home health and older adult daily living center services.
Title
In public assistance, providing for medical assistance deemed eligibility program for home care, home health and older adult daily living center services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |