PA SB31 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 26, 2001 (P.L.755, No.77), known as the Tobacco Settlement Act, in Commonwealth universal research enhancement, establishing the Spinal Cord Injury Research Program and Spinal Cord Research Advisory Committee, further providing for department responsibilities and for use of funds and providing for spinal cord injury research programs funding.
Title
In Commonwealth universal research enhancement, establishing the Spinal Cord Injury Research Program and Spinal Cord Research Advisory Committee, further providing for department responsibilities and for use of funds and providing for spinal cord injury research programs funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 31 PN 12, FP (Y: 173 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 31 PN 12, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 31 PN 12, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 126 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (173-13) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-15 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-15 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-11 | House | Removed from table |
2018-10-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-11 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-10-02 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2018-09-25 | House | In the House |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |