PA SB310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-24 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-24 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; providing for organization and powers and duties of the Health Care Competition Oversight Board; in licensing of health care facilities, further providing for definitions, for licensure and for issuance of license; in general provisions, repeals and effective date, providing for confidentiality; and making editorial changes.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; providing for organization and powers and duties of the Health Care Competition Oversight Board; in licensing of health care facilities, further providing for definitions, for licensure and for issuance of license; in general provisions, repeals and effective date, providing for confidentiality; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill laid on the table |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |