PA SB325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: House Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 22, 1951 (P.L.317, No.69), known as The Professional Nursing Law, providing for the definition of "certified registered nurse anesthetist"; further providing for registered nurse, clinical nurse specialist, use of title and abbreviation "R.N." or "C.N.S." and credentials and fraud; and providing for certified registered nurse anesthetist and qualifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the definition of "certified registered nurse anesthetist"; further providing for registered nurse, clinical nurse specialist, use of title and abbreviation "R.N." or "C.N.S." and credentials and fraud; and providing for certified registered nurse anesthetist and qualifications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 325 PN 307, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-06-24HouseIn the House
2019-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-17SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-17SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-12SenateReported as committed
2019-02-26SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback