PA SB327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for COVID-19 emergency statutory and regulatory suspensions and waivers reporting requirements, for COVID-19 debt cost reduction review and for COVID-19 Cost and Recovery Task Force; in powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for report of State facilities owned or leased; providing for emergency regulatory tolling and for COVID-19 county emergency mitigation plan for businesses; and making an appropriation.
Title
Providing for COVID-19 emergency statutory and regulatory suspensions and waivers reporting requirements, for COVID-19 debt cost reduction review and for COVID-19 Cost and Recovery Task Force; in powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for report of State facilities owned or leased; providing for emergency regulatory tolling and for COVID-19 county emergency mitigation plan for businesses; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - House - House Floor: SB 327 PN 1700, CONCUR (Y: 108 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 1700, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: SB 327 PN 1655, CONCUR (Y: 108 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 1637, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04909 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04936 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04960 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Floor: SB 327 PN 1627, FP (Y: 108 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04129 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 309, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 1700, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - House - House Floor: SB 327 PN 1655, CONCUR (Y: 108 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 1637, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04909 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04936 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04960 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Floor: SB 327 PN 1627, FP (Y: 108 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04129 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 327 PN 309, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | Veto No. 7 |
2020-05-19 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2020-05-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-14 | House | Signed in House |
2020-05-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the Senate (108-94) |
2020-05-14 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-05-14 | House | Re-referred to RULES |
2020-05-13 | House | In the House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments, as amended by the Senate (28-20) |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-04-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the House (108-94) |
2020-04-20 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2020-04-16 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-04-15 | House | In the House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (29-21) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-04-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (108-93) |
2020-04-07 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-03-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-24 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-11-22 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-11-19 | House | In the House |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |