PA SB332 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to COMMERCE
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in forgery and fraudulent practices, further providing for bad checks.
Title
In forgery and fraudulent practices, further providing for bad checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 332 PN 314, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2019-10-28 | House | In the House |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |