PA SB337 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, providing for the offense of sexual extortion.
Title
In sexual offenses, providing for the offense of sexual extortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |